IN SB0163 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of health matters. Allows the state department of health (state department) to use information from the cancer registry to conduct an investigation into the incidence of cancer diagnosis in a geographic region and to share the information with a local health department if certain conditions are met. Allows a local child fatality team to investigate the death of a child whose death occurred in the area served by the local child fatality review team. Requires that a report must be submitted to the state child fatality review coordinator before July 1 each year. Requires the state department to study
Title
Department of health matters. Allows the state department of health (state department) to use information from the cancer registry to conduct an investigation into the incidence of cancer diagnosis in a geographic region and to share the information with a local health department if certain conditions are met. Allows a local child fatality team to investigate the death of a child whose death occurred in the area served by the local child fatality review team. Requires that a report must be submitted to the state child fatality review coordinator before July 1 each year. Requires the state department to study
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] |
Rep. Charlie Brown [D] | Rep. Thomas Saunders [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 29 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2016-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 226: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2016-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-11 | House | Representative Saunders added as cosponsor |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Brown, C. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Miller Patricia) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Becker added as second author |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Miller Patricia |