IN SB0163 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Errington added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Errington added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that for all taxing units, the maximum amount allowed for an operating balance for a debt service fund is 50% for 2015 through 2018 of the budget estimate for annual debt service payments from the fund for debt originally incurred before July 1, 2014, and 10% on debt originally incurred after June 30, 2014, and for all debt after 2018. Permits a school corporation that experiences at least a 20% loss to the school corporation's transportation fund due to circuit breaker credits in 2014, 2015, or 2016 to use a proportional circuit breaker credit allocation for that year.
Title
Property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 016301 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 016301 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Errington added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Banks added as second author. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Friend added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 66: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Crider added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as third author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |