IN SB0161 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that for purposes of computing sales tax, a seller may elect to round the tax on an item basis or an invoice basis. Removes blood glucose monitoring meters from the separate sales tax exemption for blood glucose supplies to comply with the Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement. Provides that blood glucose meters and the packaging or literature for a blood glucose meter furnished without charge by a diabetic supply distributor are exempt from sales tax. (Blood glucose meters would also be exempt from sales tax as durable medical equipment if sold or rented under a prescription.) Provides that the sales tax exemption for blood glucose monitoring supplies applies only to supplies furnished without charge. Provides that the value of an Olympic medal and prize money paid by the United States Olympic Committee to the winner of an Olympic medal are exempt from the Indiana adjusted gross income tax.
Title
Tax issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Lindel Hume [D] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 016103 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 016101 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 016103 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 016101 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 87 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 369: yeas 37 and nays 2 |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 333: yeas 94 and nays 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-26 | House | SB 161 Amendment #1 (Austin), prevailed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Goodin added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative T. Brown added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Turner added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 147: yeas 46 and nays 2 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Re-read second time; amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | SB 161 Amendment #1 (Kenley), prevailed. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Returned to second reading |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Hume added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read second time; ordered engrossed |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kenley. |