IN SB0161 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows type II gaming retailers to profit from qualified drawings. Includes sales of the tickets in the retailer's gross receipts. Requires the rules of the game to specify whether the retailer will retain the profits or return the total amount wagered in the form of prizes. Requires retailers to report the amounts retained.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Type II gaming.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2010-01-21 Senator Deig added as second author
2010-01-21 Senator Deig removed as coauthor
2010-01-21 Cosponsor: Rep. Bell
2010-01-21 House sponsor: Rep. VanHaaften
2010-01-21 Referred to the House
2010-01-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 28: Yeas 42 and Nays 8
2010-01-19 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-14 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-11 Senator Deig added as coauthor
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Alting

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback