IN SB0160 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Juvenile law. Allows an adult court having jurisdiction over a minor charged with an offense requiring the automatic transfer of jurisdiction to the adult court to withhold judgment and transfer jurisdiction to the juvenile court for adjudication and disposition if the minor is convicted of an offense, but not convicted of an offense requiring the automatic transfer of jurisdiction to the adult court. Allows an intake officer to impose conditions upon the release of a child who was not taken into custody under an order of the court. Requires the juvenile court to hold a detention hearing within 48 hours
Title
Juvenile law. Allows an adult court having jurisdiction over a minor charged with an offense requiring the automatic transfer of jurisdiction to the adult court to withhold judgment and transfer jurisdiction to the juvenile court for adjudication and disposition if the minor is convicted of an offense, but not convicted of an offense requiring the automatic transfer of jurisdiction to the adult court. Allows an intake officer to impose conditions upon the release of a child who was not taken into custody under an order of the court. Requires the juvenile court to hold a detention hearing within 48 hours
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 28 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 327: yeas 42, nays 0 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as coauthor |
2016-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | House | Representative Macer added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | Representative McNamara added as cosponsor |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senator Steele added as third author |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senator Bray added as second author |
2016-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Washburne |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 127: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Young R Michael) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young R Michael |