IN SB0156 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle crash investigations. Changes the property damage requirement to $2,500 (current law is $1,000) for certain failures to provide evidence of financial responsibility following a motor vehicle accident. Changes the apparent damage requirement for a law enforcement officer to investigate motor vehicle accidents involving property damage to $2,500 (current law is $1,000). Provides that a law enforcement officer shall assist operators with the requirements of IC 9-26-1-1.1 under certain circumstances. Adds certain infractions and offenses to the list of violations enforceable by weigh station supervisors or operators.
Title
Motor vehicle crash investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 88 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 234: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pressel |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Gaskill) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |