IN SB0155 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the board of trustees of a state educational institution may not impose or allow any mandatory or presumptive age limits in the hiring, the retention in a position, or continuation of employment of any officers, faculty, or counsel of the institution. Excludes a: (1) fire department established by; or (2) police officer appointed by; the board of trustees of a state educational institution.
Title
Higher education employment age limits.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Timothy Skinner [D] |
Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-30 | House sponsor: Rep. Koch | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 49 and nays 1 | |
2012-01-26 | Senators Buck and Kruse added as coauthors | |
2012-01-25 | Senator Skinner added as coauthor | |
2012-01-24 | Amendment 1 (M. Young), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-24 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Senator Head added as second author | |
2012-01-19 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Steele |