IN SB0153 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Drug and alcohol treatment report. Requires the state department of health, with the assistance of the department of administration and the secretary of family and social services, to report to the legislative council concerning the: (1) number of hospital beds currently available in Indiana; (2) location and physical description of state owned buildings that are currently available, or expected to be available before July 1, 2018, for conversion and use; and (3) feasibility of using currently unused hospital and health care facility beds; for drug and alcohol detoxification, treatment, and rehabilitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug and alcohol treatment report. Requires the state department of health, with the assistance of the department of administration and the secretary of family and social services, to report to the legislative council concerning the: (1) number of hospital beds currently available in Indiana; (2) location and physical description of state owned buildings that are currently available, or expected to be available before July 1, 2018, for conversion and use; and (3) feasibility of using currently unused hospital and health care facility beds; for drug and alcohol detoxification, treatment, and rehabilitation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2017-02-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-01-31SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2017-01-31SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer
2017-01-31SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 47: yeas 49, nays 0
2017-01-30SenateSenators Crider, Leising, Becker added as coauthors
2017-01-30SenateAmendment #1 (Merritt) prevailed; voice vote
2017-01-30SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-01-26SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-01-24SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2017-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2017-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback