IN SB0153 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Employment of children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment of children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 41
2013-04-09SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-03-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-03-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-03-19SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-03-11HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2013-03-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 92, nays 4
2013-03-07HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-07HouseRepresentative Carbaugh added as cosponsor
2013-03-05HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2013-01-29SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor
2013-01-29SenateCosponsors: Reps. Bacon and Riecken
2013-01-29SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Crouch
2013-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2013-01-29SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 48 and nays 0
2013-01-28SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2013-01-28SenateSenator M. Young added as coauthor
2013-01-28SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-24SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-10SenateSenator Waltz added as coauthor
2013-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2013-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Becker

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback