IN SB0152 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Delaware circuit courts. Removes the sixth circuit court in Delaware County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delaware circuit courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-24HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2021-03-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 290: yeas 67, nays 27
2021-03-22HouseRepresentative Young J added as cosponsor
2021-03-22HouseRepresentative McNamara added as cosponsor
2021-03-22HouseRepresentatives Prescott and Young J removed as cosponsors
2021-03-22HouseRepresentative Prescott added as sponsor
2021-03-22HouseRepresentative McNamara removed as sponsor
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-09HouseRepresentative Young J added as cosponsor
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateCosponsor: Representative Prescott
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative McNamara
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 175: yeas 35, nays 13
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-16SenateSenator Brown L added as second author
2021-02-08SenateSenator Gaskill added as author
2021-02-08SenateSenator Bray removed as author
2021-02-08SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2021-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/152/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/c/a/cfcaaf02/SB0152.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/5/d/505d544f/SB0152.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/a/f/6aaf7806/SB0152.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/8/9/e789886a/SB0152.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/b/3/d3b3c6a7/SB0152.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/f/2/c9f262d3/SB0152.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/4/5/8845d6c2/SB0152.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/6/4/5b647a84/SB0152.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/5/d/db5d9d30/SB0152.05.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/d/f/9cdf8f00/SB0152.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/8/7/b0879e66/SB0152.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/3/a/963a941a/SB0152.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/9/b/139b187b/SB0152.02.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/2/6/d426842a/SB0152.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/b/b/ebbbae98/SB0152.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/3/c/f93c4c81/SB0152.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/2/a/0f2ae64f/SB0152.03.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/e/a/79ea8a5f/SB0152.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/e/1/43e1d954/SB0152.04.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/e/a/64eadfff/SB0152.04.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/3/f/5f3f5933/SB0152.05.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/0/2/3502dfc3/SB0152.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/4/1/95418b3e/SB0152.175_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/9/6/a396f035/SB0152.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/6/3/bd6390e1/SB0152.290_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback