IN SB0148 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prosecuting attorneys. Permits a prosecuting attorney to purchase a crime insurance policy instead of executing a surety bond. Permits the department of child services or a prosecuting attorney to file a paternity action in certain cases. Renames the drug prosecution fund as the substance abuse prosecution fund. Broadens the types of expenses a county auditor shall pay the prosecuting attorney in connection with a criminal case. Allows a prosecuting attorney to appoint employees with the approval of the county council. Allows the prosecuting attorneys council of Indiana to call two conferences each year and specifies who may attend the conferences. Requires the prosecuting attorneys council of Indiana to conduct certain training. Provides a prosecuting attorney with defense and indemnification in a disciplinary action for conduct that occurred within the scope of employment.
Title
Prosecuting attorneys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Public Law 55 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 319: yeas 36, nays 8 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment #1 (Steuerwald) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-24 | House | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed back on second reading |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: without recommendation, adopted |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |