IN SB0136 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Public Law 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Public Law 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dental plans. Prohibits a dental plan (an insurance policy, a health maintenance organization contract, or a preferred provider plan) from directly or indirectly requiring a dental provider to provide a dental service to a covered individual at a fee amount that is: (1) set by the dental plan; or (2) subject to the approval of the dental plan; unless the dental service is a covered service under the dental plan. Prohibits a third party administrator or another person from arranging for a dental provider to provide dental services for a dental plan that sets the amount of the fee for any dental services unless the dental services are covered services under the dental plan. Authorizes the insurance commissioner to issue a cease and desist order against a person that violates any of these prohibitions and, if the person violates the cease and desist order, to impose a civil penalty upon the person and suspend or revoke the person's certificate of authority.
Title
Dental plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Public Law 42 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 257: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 218: yeas 93, nays 4 |
2022-02-17 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Garten added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as third author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as second author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Doriot removed as second author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Schaibley, Carbaugh, Lehman |
2022-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Zent |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 50: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Koch removed as coauthor |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zay |