IN SB0136 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the redistricting study committee. Requires the committee to: (1) study the topic of redistricting and make recommendations on ways to improve the redistricting process; (2) study proposals to amend the Constitution of the State of Indiana to establish an independent commission to draw legislative and congressional district boundaries, beginning with the 2021 redistricting; (3) examine the successes and failures of redistricting commissions in other states and analyze the results of the 2010 election in Indiana and other states to make recommendations to the general assembly; and (4) consider certain standards for drawing legislative and congressional districts.
Title
Redistricting study committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Dorothy Landske [R] |
Sen. Connie Lawson [R] | Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures | |
2010-01-28 | Senators Hershman and Randolph added as coauthors | |
2010-01-28 | Cosponsor: Rep. Richardson | |
2010-01-28 | House sponsor: Rep. Battles | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: Yeas 45 and Nays 3 | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Lanane added as coauthor | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-19 | Senator Miller added as coauthor | |
2010-01-11 | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senators Landske and Lawson |