IN SB0132 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Wrongful death. Provides that a person who has been found guilty, or guilty but mentally ill, on a charge of causing an unlawful death of a decedent is a constructive trustee of certain property acquired or entitled to be received by the culpable person. Includes a married individual who does not have any dependents and whose death was caused by a spouse within the definition of "adult person" for the purpose of a wrongful death action. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Wrongful death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senators Brown L, Koch, Bohacek, Glick, Gaskill, Buck added as coauthors |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as second author |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |