IN SB0123 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Representative Campbell added as cosponsor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Representative Campbell added as cosponsor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Audiology and speech-language pathology compact. Enacts the audiology and speech-language pathology interstate compact. Establishes requirements regarding: (1) speech-language pathology assistants; and (2) the supervision of speech-language pathology support personnel. Requires the speech-language pathology and audiology board to adopt rules not later than June 30, 2022. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Audiology and speech-language pathology compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Chris Campbell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Representative Campbell added as cosponsor |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2021-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Kruse) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2021-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |