IN SB0120 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Invasive species council. Postpones the expiration of the law establishing the invasive species council from July 1, 2015, to July 1, 2023. Changes references to the entity within which the invasive species council is established to reflect the change of that entity's name to the Purdue University College of Agriculture.
Title
Invasive species council. Postpones the expiration of the law establishing the invasive species council from July 1, 2015, to July 1, 2023. Changes references to the entity within which the invasive species council is established to reflect the change of that entity's name to the Purdue University College of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senators Zakas, Kruse, Buck added as coauthors |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senator Delph added as third author |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Representative Cherry added as sponsor |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 65: yeas 44, nays 0 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Glick |