IN SB0118 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Property tax appeals. Requires the county assessor, with regard to each notice filed of a property tax assessment appeal of commercial or industrial property, to do the following: (1) Make a list of affected taxing units and information about the taxpayer and the property's assessed value. (2) Make the information available for the inspection of the fiscal officer of each of the affected taxing units.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax appeals. Requires the county assessor, with regard to each notice filed of a property tax assessment appeal of commercial or industrial property, to do the following: (1) Make a list of affected taxing units and information about the taxpayer and the property's assessed value. (2) Make the information available for the inspection of the fiscal officer of each of the affected taxing units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2015-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2015-01-27SenateSenator Head added as second author
2015-01-27SenateSenator Head removed as coauthor
2015-01-27SenateRepresentative Smaltz added as sponsor
2015-01-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-01-26SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-22SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-20SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2015-01-15SenateSenator Head added as coauthor
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback