IN SB0111 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the soil productivity factors used for the March 1, 2011, assessment of agricultural land must be used for the March 1, 2014, assessment date. Specifies that new soil productivity factors shall be used for assessment dates occurring after March 1, 2014.
Title
Soil productivity factors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 011102 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 011101 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 011102 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 011101 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 85 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 458: yeas 97 and nays 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 392: yeas 45 and nays 0 |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Niezgodski added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Frye added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Morrison added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Goodin added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Lehe added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Walker added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Leising added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 368: yeas 96 and nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | House | SB 111 Amendment #1 (Ober), prevailed. |
2014-02-26 | House | Representative Cox added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-11 | House | Representative Frye added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Representative Cherry added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Representative Lehe added as sponsor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 26: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Walker added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as co-author. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as third author. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as second author. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |