IN SB0109 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of wild animals and hunting preserves. Excludes the wild animal permit from the law requiring notice and hearing on an application for certain permits. Provides that certain fish and wildlife laws do not apply to certain legally owned captive bred cervidae and members of the bovidae family that may be hunted as permitted animals on hunting preserves. Provides for the initial licensing by the state board of animal health of hunting preserves on which permitted animals are hunted. Establishes licensing requirements, inspection requirements, and fees. Exempts licensed hunting preserves and cervidae livestock operations from the licensing requirements for game
Title
Regulation of wild animals and hunting preserves. Excludes the wild animal permit from the law requiring notice and hearing on an application for certain permits. Provides that certain fish and wildlife laws do not apply to certain legally owned captive bred cervidae and members of the bovidae family that may be hunted as permitted animals on hunting preserves. Provides for the initial licensing by the state board of animal health of hunting preserves on which permitted animals are hunted. Establishes licensing requirements, inspection requirements, and fees. Exempts licensed hunting preserves and cervidae livestock operations from the licensing requirements for game
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Errington) failed (Y: 32 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #5 (Mrvan) failed (Y: 13 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Errington) failed (Y: 32 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #5 (Mrvan) failed (Y: 13 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Public Law 89 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-29 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2016-02-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 274: yeas 61, nays 35 |
2016-02-25 | House | Amendment #1 (Errington) failed; Roll Call 245: yeas 32, nays 61 |
2016-02-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Representatives Goodin and Niezgodski added as cosponsors |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Lehe |
2016-01-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Eberhart |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 34: yeas 29, nays 19 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Mrvan) failed; Roll Call 13: yeas 13, nays 37 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Stoops) failed; voice vote |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Stoops) failed; voice vote |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as third author |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Messmer |