IN SB0105 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directors of mutual benefit corporations. Allows directors of certain mutual benefit corporations to vote by proxy. Specifies requirements for appointment of a proxy.
Title
Directors of mutual benefit corporations. Allows directors of certain mutual benefit corporations to vote by proxy. Specifies requirements for appointment of a proxy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 98 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 370: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as second author |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Houchin |