IN SB0105 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Senator Randolph added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Senator Randolph added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a political subdivision may file a petition with the distressed unit appeal board (board) seeking designation of the political subdivision as a distressed political subdivision, based on any one of several failures by the political subdivision to meet its financial obligations. Provides that if the board designates a political subdivision as a distressed political subdivision, the board shall appoint an emergency manager for the distressed political subdivision. Provides that an emergency manager of a distressed political subdivision has broad powers to effect the financial rehabilitation of the distressed political subdivision. Reduces the number of members on the board to three: the director of the office of management and budget, the commissioner of the department of local government finance, and the state examiner of the state board of accounts. Specifies additional circumstances under which the pledge of revenues for the repayment of an obligation creates a statutory lien, and prohibits an issuer from changing the provisions of an obligation without the consent of 100% of the owners of all outstanding obligations.
Title
Adjustments of debt of a political subdivision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Leonard), prevailed (Y: 50 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Amendment 3 (DeLaney), failed (Y: 34 N: 58 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Amendment 5 (V. Smith), failed (Y: 32 N: 61 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Leonard), prevailed (Y: 50 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Amendment 3 (DeLaney), failed (Y: 34 N: 58 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Amendment 5 (V. Smith), failed (Y: 32 N: 61 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Senator Randolph added as advisor | |
2011-04-25 | House advisors appointed: Foley, Leonard, Bardon and V. Smith | |
2011-04-25 | House conferees appointed: Soliday and C. Brown | |
2011-04-25 | Senate advisors appointed: Bray, Tallian and Glick | |
2011-04-25 | Senate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Rogers | |
2011-04-25 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 620: yeas 60, nays 36 | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment 2 (C. Brown), withdrawn | |
2011-04-20 | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment 1 (Leonard), prevailed; Roll Call 596: yeas 50, nays 41 | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment 3 (DeLaney), failed; Roll Call 595: yeas 34, nays 58 | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment 5 (V. Smith), failed; Roll Call 594: yeas 32, nays 61 | |
2011-04-20 | Second reading: amended, call withdrawn | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Reassigned to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-02-08 | Cosponsor: Rep. Foley | |
2011-02-08 | House sponsor: Rep. Soliday | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-08 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 43 and nays 6 | |
2011-02-07 | Amendment 1 (Rogers), prevailed; | |
2011-02-07 | Amendment 3 (Charbonneau), prevailed; | |
2011-02-07 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Senator Broden added as coauthor | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-24 | Senator Glick added as coauthor | |
2011-01-20 | Senator Lanane added as coauthor | |
2011-01-12 | Senator Holdman added as coauthor | |
2011-01-11 | Senators Alting, Head, Hershman, Eckerty and Arnold added as coauthors | |
2011-01-11 | Senator Rogers added as third author | |
2011-01-11 | Senator Bray added as second author | |
2011-01-11 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |