IN SB0102 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 03/24/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a person granted the authority to direct the disposition of remains of a service member in a certain United States Department of Defense form is second (after the person designated in a funeral planning directive) in the priority of individuals who may authorize the cremation of another person's remains and who may authorize the owner of a cemetery to inter, entomb, or inurn the body or cremated remains of a deceased human.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military and veteran matters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 03/24/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 101
2010-03-24 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-19 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-16 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-10 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 316: Yeas 95, Nays 0
2010-03-05 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 277: Yeas 50, Nays 0
2010-03-04 Rules suspended
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2010-03-02 Representatives Wolkins and Soliday appointed as House advisors
2010-03-02 Representative Truitt added as conferee
2010-03-02 Representative Truitt removed as House advisor
2010-03-02 Representative Soliday removed as conferee
2010-03-01 Senator R. Young added as conferee
2010-03-01 Senator Arnold removed as conferee
2010-03-01 Senator Mrvan added as advisor
2010-03-01 Senator R. Young removed as advisor
2010-02-25 House advisors appointed: Robertson, Ruppel and Truitt
2010-02-25 House conferees appointed: Tincher and Soliday
2010-02-24 Senate advisor appointed: Charbonneau and R. Young
2010-02-24 Senate conferee appointed: Wyss and Arnold
2010-02-24 Senate dissented from House amendments
2010-02-22 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2010-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 192: Yeas 97, Nays 0
2010-02-18 Amendment 1 (Ruppel), withdrawn
2010-02-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-16 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-15 Representative Barnes added as cosponsor
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2010-02-02 Senators Zakas, Landske and Paul added as coauthors
2010-02-02 Cosponsor: Rep. Soliday
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. Tincher
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 95: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-26 Senator Charbonneau added as second author
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation & Veterans Affairs
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Wyss

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback