IN SB0101 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Public Law 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Public Law 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds causing property damage to an agricultural operation to the existing crime of institutional criminal mischief. Increases the sentence enhancement monetary thresholds for criminal mischief and institutional criminal mischief. Provides that a person commits criminal trespass if, without the owner's permission, the person enters: (1) that portion of an agricultural operation that is used for production; or (2) any part of the real property of an agricultural operation and causes property damage.
Title
Agricultural operations and trespass.
Sponsors
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Richard Young [D] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - (Y: 25 N: 59 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2014-02-17 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 010103 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 010101 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - (Y: 25 N: 59 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2014-02-17 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 010103 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 010101 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public Law 21 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 247: yeas 73 and nays 25 |
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-20 | House | SB 101 Amendment #1 (DeLaney), failed. |
2014-02-20 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-20 | House | Representative McMillin added as sponsor. |
2014-02-20 | House | Representative Steuerwald removed as sponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Representative Steuerwald added as sponsor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 85: yeas 41 and nays 5 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | SB 101 Amendment #2 (Holdman), prevailed. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report; amend do pass; adopted |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as coauthor. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |