IN SB0097 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a person may not be convicted of certain offenses relating to public intoxication unless the person: (1) endangers the person's life; (2) endangers the life of another person; (3) breaches the peace or is in imminent danger of breaching the peace; or (4) harasses, annoys, or alarms another person. Prohibits a person from initiating or maintaining an action against a law enforcement officer based on the officer's failure to enforce certain laws concerning public intoxication offenses.
Title
Public intoxication.
Sponsors
Sen. Lindel Hume [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-12 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 338: yeas 44, nays 6 | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 391: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2012-03-09 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-01 | House advisors appointed: McMillin and Pierce | |
2012-03-01 | House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Dvorak | |
2012-02-29 | Senate advisors appointed: Steele, Randolph and Banks | |
2012-02-29 | Senate conferee appointed: M. Young and Taylor | |
2012-02-29 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2012-02-28 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 256: yeas 95, nays 0 | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 1 (Dvorak), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Representative McMillin added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | |
2012-01-30 | House sponsor: Rep. Steuerwald | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 30 and nays 20 | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-24 | Senators Steele, Tomes and Hume added as coauthors | |
2012-01-24 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-10 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senators M. Young and Taylor |