IN SB0096 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
Pending: House Family, Children and Human Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
Pending: House Family, Children and Human Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the prenatal substance abuse commission and requires the commission to develop and recommend a coordinated plan to improve early intervention and treatment for pregnant women who abuse alcohol or drugs or use tobacco. (The commission was originally created in 2007 and expired December 31, 2009.)
Title
Prenatal substance abuse commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Noe | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Riecken | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 94: Yeas 42, Nays 8 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Senators Becker and Rogers added as coauthors | |
2010-01-11 | Senator Kruse added as second author | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Errington |