IN SB0095 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Annexation. Provides, with certain exceptions, that the following apply to annexations for which an annexation ordinance is adopted after May 14, 2021: (1) A municipality initiating an annexation must file a petition with the court signed by: (A) at least 51% of the owners of land that is not exempt from property taxes in the annexation territory; or (B) the owners of more than 75% in assessed valuation of land that is not exempt from property taxes in the annexation territory. (2) If the petition filed by the municipality has enough signatures, the court must hold a hearing to review the annexation. (3) Adds provisions regarding the validity of a signature on an annexation petition. (4) Eliminates the remonstrance procedure for annexations and reimbursement of remonstrator's attorney's fees and costs. (5) Provides that remonstrance waivers are void for annexations for which the annexation ordinance is adopted after May 14, 2021. (6) Provides that a settlement agreement in lieu of annexation that is executed after May 14, 2021, is void. (7) Eliminates provisions regarding the contiguity of a public highway. Eliminates provisions that prohibit an annexation from taking effect in the year preceding the year that a federal decennial census is conducted.
Title
Annexation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Cherry |
2021-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Thompson |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 34, nays 14 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |