IN SB0093 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tuition for qualified nonresident veterans. Provides that a qualified nonresident veteran who enrolls in a state educational institution not later than three years after the date of the qualified nonresident veteran's discharge or separation from the armed forces of the United States or the Indiana National Guard is eligible to pay the resident tuition rate at a state educational institution. Establishes requirements for eligibility.
Title
Tuition for qualified nonresident veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public Law 24 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-03-24 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2021-03-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Representative Clere added as cosponsor |
2021-03-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Andrade M |
2021-02-16 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Gutwein |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senators Becker, Glick, Buck, Sandlin added as coauthors |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 106: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senator Garten added as coauthor |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senators Kruse and Raatz added as coauthors |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as third author |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Baldwin S added as second author |
2021-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |