IN SB0092 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a licensed land surveyor to enter any land or property within Indiana to conduct a survey. Provides procedures for notifying a landowner and makes a surveyor liable for damage caused by the entry.
Title
Land surveyors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-01-28 | Cosponsor: Rep. Steuerwald | |
2010-01-28 | House sponsor: Rep. Grubb | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 54: Yeas 45 and Nays 3 | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Randolph added as second author | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Randolph removed as coauthor | |
2010-01-25 | Amendment 1 (Boots), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2010-01-21 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Boots |