IN SB0088 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that when notice of an insanity defense is filed in a case in which the defendant is not charged with a homicide offense, the court shall appoint two or three competent disinterested: (1) psychiatrists; (2) psychologists endorsed by the state psychology board as health service providers in psychology; or (3) physicians; who have expertise in determining insanity, at least one of whom must be a psychiatrist or psychologist. Provides that when notice of an insanity defense is filed in a case in which the defendant is charged with a homicide offense, the court shall appoint two or three competent disinterested: (1) psychiatrists; (2) psychologists endorsed by the state psychology board as health service providers in psychology; or (3) physicians; who have expertise in determining insanity, at least one of whom must be a psychiatrist and at least one of whom must be a psychologist.
Title
Mental health witnesses in criminal cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 008803 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 008802 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 008803 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 008802 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 54 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 350: yeas 48 and nays 1 |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 314: yeas 91 and nays 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Representative C. Brown added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Bacon added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 142: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Becker added as third author. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as second author. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amended do pass |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Reassigned to Public Policy, pursuant to rule 68(b) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Alting added as first author. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Long removed as first author. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: amended do pass, reassigned to Judiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |