IN SB0078 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Public Law 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Public Law 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Shovel ready site development center. Defines "office" as the office of community and rural affairs for purposes of the law governing the shovel ready site development center (center). Provides that the office shall, in cooperation with the Indiana economic development corporation and political subdivisions, administer the center to enable political subdivisions to obtain permits to create sites that are ready for economic development. Provides that the office shall serve as the certifying body for acceptance into the program and determine the criteria to be used to certify sites.
Title
Shovel ready site development center.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Ethan Manning [R] |
Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Rita Fleming [D] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Public Law 30 |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 269: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Representatives Morris, Fleming, Miller added as cosponsors |
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Manning |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 26: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second author |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Messmer |