IN SB0075 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 30: yeas 18, nays 30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 30: yeas 18, nays 30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Local government liaison. Requires the department of local government finance (DLGF) to designate a staff member to direct inquiries or requests for assistance from local government officials to the appropriate staff person or entity. Requires the DLGF to report annually regarding the services provided by the department.
Title
Local government liaison. Requires the department of local government finance (DLGF) to designate a staff member to direct inquiries or requests for assistance from local government officials to the appropriate staff person or entity. Requires the DLGF to report annually regarding the services provided by the department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 30: yeas 18, nays 30 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |