IN SB0074 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Section 16 effective 03/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Section 16 effective 03/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to motor vehicle law pertaining to commercial driver's licenses to conform to the Code of Federal Regulations. Exempts certain intrastate private carriers of person or property, or both, from certain federal requirements pertaining to commercial motor vehicles. Repeals and relocates language concerning regulation of certain motor carriers and private carriers of property.
Title
Commercial driver's licenses and commercial motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Section 16 effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 4 through 15 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 1 through 3 effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 9 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-04 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House | |
2010-03-04 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 255: Yeas 49, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 226: Yeas 97, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-22 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-02 | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | |
2010-01-19 | Cosponsor: Rep. Duncan | |
2010-01-19 | House sponsor: Rep. Austin | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 16: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-01-14 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2010-01-14 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-12 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation & Veterans Affairs | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senators Wyss and Rogers |