IN SB0072 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment
Pending: House Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a member of the public employees' retirement fund (PERF) or the Indiana state teachers' retirement fund (TRF) may petition the board of trustees of the member's fund (board) to correct an error in a determination of the member's: (1) creditable service; or (2) benefit; at any time. Provides that if the board does not find an error in the determination and the member petitioned the board within six years after the determination, the member may appeal the board's decision under the administrative orders and procedures law. Updates language concerning the TRF board's distribution of TRF's investment earnings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERF and TRF benefit determination review.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment
2010-01-26 Cosponsor: Rep. Hinkle
2010-01-26 House sponsor: Rep. Niezgodski
2010-01-26 Referred to the House
2010-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 38: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-01-21 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-14 Senator Deig added as coauthor
2010-01-14 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2010-01-05 Authored by Senators Tallian and M. Young

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback