IN SB0067 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Small estates. Increases the value of estates that may be distributed via affidavit from $50,000 to $100,000. Increases the threshold for summary procedures for unsupervised estates from $50,000 to $100,000. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the probate code study commission.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small estates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-26SenateReferred to the House
2022-01-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2022-01-20SenateSenator Yoder added as coauthor
2022-01-20SenateSenator Pol added as coauthor
2022-01-20SenateSenators Freeman and Buck added as coauthors
2022-01-20SenateSenator Young M added as second author
2022-01-20SenateCosponsor: Representative DeLaney
2022-01-20SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Young J
2022-01-20SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 43, nays 4
2022-01-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2022-01-13SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2022-01-11SenateSenator Gaskill added as coauthor
2022-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Lanane

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/senate/67/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/0/9/85092dd9/SB0067.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/4/3/7643f989/SB0067.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/4/4/8c446f7e/SB0067.02.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/d/5/48d54186/SB0067.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/5/8/3f58ea00/SB0067.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/a/a/4eaa12de/SB0067.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/b/2/d9b2eadd/SB0067.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/b/d/8cbd3540/SB0067.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/0/c/840ca1d0/SB0067.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/f/3/55f3d135/SB0067.23_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback