IN SB0066 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Representatives Morrison, Pfaff, Heaton added as cosponsors
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Representatives Morrison, Pfaff, Heaton added as cosponsors
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Donation of income tax refund for cancer research. Establishes the cancer research account within the Indiana health care account. Provides that a taxpayer may designate all or a part of the taxpayer's state income tax refund to be paid over to the cancer research account. Provides that the budget agency shall distribute the money in the cancer research account in equal amounts to the Indiana University Melvin and Bren Simon Cancer Center and the Purdue University Center for Cancer Research.
Title
Donation of income tax refund for cancer research.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] |
Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. Alan Morrison [R] | Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D] |
Rep. Robert Heaton [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Representatives Morrison, Pfaff, Heaton added as cosponsors |
2020-02-17 | House | Representatives Pfaff and Heaton removed as cosponsors |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Cherry added as sponsor |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Morrison removed as sponsor |
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senators Lanane and Randolph added as coauthors |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Pfaff and Heaton |
2020-01-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Morrison |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 56: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Leising added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |