IN SB0064 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a police officer from extracting or otherwise downloading information from a telecommunications device without the owner's consent for a violation of the law concerning typing, transmitting, or reading a text message while operating a motor vehicle unless: (1) the police officer has probable cause to believe that the telecommunications device has been used in the commission of a crime; (2) the information is extracted or otherwise downloaded under a valid search warrant; or (3) otherwise authorized by law. Provides that if a law enforcement officer detains a person because the law enforcement officer believes the person has committed an infraction or ordinance violation, the law enforcement officer may not, without the person's consent, extract or otherwise download information from a cellular telephone or another wireless or cellular communications device possessed by the person at the time the person is detained unless: (1) the law enforcement officer has probable cause to believe that the cellular telephone or other wireless or cellular communications device has been used in the commission of a crime; (2) the information is extracted or otherwise downloaded under a valid search warrant; or (3) otherwise authorized by law.
Title
Downloading of cell phone information by police.
Sponsors
Sen. Brent Waltz [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] |
Sen. Michael Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 11 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 100404 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 006401 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House Floor - (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 27 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 29 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-01-09 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 100401 (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 11 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 100404 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 006401 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House Floor - (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 27 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 29 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-01-09 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 100401 (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Speedy added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 140: yeas 45 and nays 3 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Young R Michael added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Waltz |