IN SB0063 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ISTEP panel. Establishes a panel to study alternatives to the ISTEP program tests and to make recommendations for replacing the ISTEP program.
Title
ISTEP panel. Establishes a panel to study alternatives to the ISTEP program tests and to make recommendations for replacing the ISTEP program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senator Glick added as coauthor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as coauthor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Brown, T. and Goodin |
2016-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as author |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Long removed as author |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |