IN SB0051 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid reimbursement for schools. Allows the office of the secretary of family and social services to apply for a Medicaid state plan amendment to allow school corporations to seek Medicaid reimbursement for medically necessary, school based Medicaid covered services that are provided under federal or state mandates. Specifies possible services for Medicaid reimbursement. Adds physical therapy to the list of services a school psychologist may refer a student. Allows a school psychologist to make referrals to physical therapists for mandated school services.
Title
Medicaid reimbursement for schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Vermilion A |
2021-02-16 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Karickhoff |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Yoder) failed; voice vote |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2021-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zay |