IN SB0050 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Chaplains in public schools. Allows a principal or superintendent of a public school, including a charter school, to employ, or approve as a volunteer, a school chaplain if certain requirements are met. Provides that a school chaplain may only provide secular support to a student or an employee of the school unless permission is given by: (1) the student receiving services if the student is an emancipated minor or adult; (2) the employee of the school receiving services; or (3) a parent of the student and the student receiving services if the student is an unemancipated minor; to provide nonsecular support. Provides that a school chaplain is not required to divulge privileged or confidential communications with a student under certain circumstances. Provides that a school chaplain and a school counselor are subject to duties to report or disclose certain information.
Title
Chaplains in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives DeVon and Davis |
2024-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative King |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 34, nays 15 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Donato) prevailed; voice vote |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senator Byrne added as coauthor |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senators Crane, Buchanan, Tomes added as coauthors |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senator Deery added as third author |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Donato |