IN SB0046 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Senator Johnson, T added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Senator Johnson, T added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parental rights. Provides that a governmental entity may not substantially burden certain parental rights unless the burden is in furtherance of a compelling governmental interest and is the least restrictive means of furthering the governmental interest. Prohibits a governmental entity from: (1) advising, directing, or coercing a child to withhold certain information from the child's parent; or (2) denying a child's parent access to certain information. Allows a parent to bring an action against a governmental entity for certain violations and provides for certain relief. Specifies that the parent of a child does not have a right to access certain medical care on behalf of the child if the child does not have an affirmative right of access to such medical care.
Title
Parental rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senator Johnson, T added as coauthor |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senator Dernulc added as coauthor |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senator Young M added as coauthor |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senator Goode G added as coauthor |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Senators Maxwell and Alexander added as coauthors |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senators Buchanan, Donato, Byrne, Raatz, Rogers, Doriot, Messmer added as coauthors |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as third author |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second author |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |
Subjects
CHILDREN AND MINORS; Generally
HEALTH; Children and Minors
MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LAW; Generally
SCHOOLS; Health and Safety Issues
STATE GOVERNMENT; Employees
HEALTH; Children and Minors
MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LAW; Generally
SCHOOLS; Health and Safety Issues
STATE GOVERNMENT; Employees