IN SB0046 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various pension matters. Establishes a single special death benefit fund to replace the two separate death benefit funds established under current law to pay death benefit claims to the beneficiaries of public safety officers or other state public employees who die in the line of duty. Provides that death benefits paid to beneficiaries of members of the following funds who die in the line of duty are to be paid from the special death benefit fund instead of the pension relief fund: (1) The 1925 police pension fund. (2) The 1937 firefighters' fund. (3) The 1953 police pension fund (Indianapolis).
Title
Various pension matters. Establishes a single special death benefit fund to replace the two separate death benefit funds established under current law to pay death benefit claims to the beneficiaries of public safety officers or other state public employees who die in the line of duty. Provides that death benefits paid to beneficiaries of members of the following funds who die in the line of duty are to be paid from the special death benefit fund instead of the pension relief fund: (1) The 1925 police pension fund. (2) The 1937 firefighters' fund. (3) The 1953 police pension fund (Indianapolis).
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Joe Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Dvorak) failed (Y: 27 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Dvorak) failed (Y: 27 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 40 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 347: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment #1 (Dvorak) failed; Roll Call 297: yeas 27, nays 57 |
2017-03-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Representative Taylor J added as cosponsor |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Burton |
2017-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 14: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senators Boots, Tallian and Walker |