IN SB0043 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Representative Lehe removed as cosponsor
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Representative Lehe removed as cosponsor
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Jumbo boats. Modifies the definition of "jumbo boat" by removing the requirement that the vessel be approved by the United States Coast Guard. Provides that a holder of a: (1) boat beer permit who operates a jumbo boat may sell beer for carryout; (2) boat liquor permit who operates a jumbo boat may sell liquor for carryout; and (3) boat wine permit who operates a jumbo boat may sell wine for carryout.
Title
Jumbo boats.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Representative Lehe removed as cosponsor |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senators Garten, Becker, Boots, Ford Jon, Grooms, Messmer, Niezgodski, Tallian, Breaux added as coauthors |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Lehe and Gutwein |
2021-02-09 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Smaltz |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 40, nays 7 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second author |
2021-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Alting |