IN SB0043 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Riecken added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Riecken added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it child seduction, a Level 6 felony, for a law enforcement officer who is at least five years older than a child who is: (1) at least 16 years of age; and (2) less than 18 years of age; to fondle or touch the child with the intent to arouse or satisfy the sexual desires of either the child or the law enforcement officer, if the law enforcement officer's contact with the child occurred in the course of the officer's official duties. Makes it child seduction, a Level 5 felony, if the law enforcement officer engages in sexual intercourse or other sexual conduct with the child. Reconciles technical and substantive conflicts between HEA 1006-2013 (the 2013 criminal code revision bill) and other bills concerning criminal law.
Title
Child seduction.
Sponsors
Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Wes Culver [R] | Rep. Christina Hale [D] |
Rep. Gail Riecken [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 004301 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 004301 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Riecken added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Hale added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 55: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Ober added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Culver added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as second author. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yoder |