IN SB0038 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lifetime parole. Requires a sexually violent predator released on lifetime parole to be placed on 24 hour GPS monitoring, subject to a sex offender risk assessment and funds specifically appropriated to the department of correction for this purpose. Requires the parole board to inform the county sheriff and prosecuting attorney: (1) that an offender has been placed on lifetime parole; and (2) whether the offender is required to wear a GPS monitoring device as a condition of parole. Provides that a person placed on lifetime parole who violates a condition of parole involving a child or a victim commits criminal
Title
Lifetime parole. Requires a sexually violent predator released on lifetime parole to be placed on 24 hour GPS monitoring, subject to a sex offender risk assessment and funds specifically appropriated to the department of correction for this purpose. Requires the parole board to inform the county sheriff and prosecuting attorney: (1) that an offender has been placed on lifetime parole; and (2) whether the offender is required to wear a GPS monitoring device as a condition of parole. Provides that a person placed on lifetime parole who violates a condition of parole involving a child or a victim commits criminal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 95 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 445: yeas 39, nays 7 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senators Crider, Crane, Kruse added as coauthors |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 406: yeas 96, nays 1 |
2017-04-04 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as cosponsor |
2017-04-04 | House | Representative Young J added as sponsor |
2017-04-04 | House | Representative Steuerwald removed as sponsor |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 31, nays 19 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senators Bohacek, Taylor G, Koch, Tomes added as coauthors |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senators Houchin and Merritt added as coauthors |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as third author |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zakas |