IN SB0036 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Public Law 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Public Law 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
NCSL 2020 Legislative Summit. Establishes the NCSL 2020 Legislative Summit host committee.
Title
NCSL 2020 Legislative Summit. Establishes the NCSL 2020 Legislative Summit host committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 6 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-02-27 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Goodin |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Bosma |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 155: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as second author |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |