IN SB0031 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation corridor development. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the topic of transportation corridor development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation corridor development. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the topic of transportation corridor development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2015-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-23SenateRepresentative Culver added as cosponsor
2015-02-23SenateRepresentative Harman added as sponsor
2015-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-02-19SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor
2015-02-19SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-17SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-05SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2015-01-29SenateSenator Arnold added as coauthor
2015-01-20SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2015-01-20SenateSenator Yoder added as second author
2015-01-06SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted, reassigned to Homeland Security & Transportation
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Zakas

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback