IN SB0018 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Senator Zay added as second author
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Disabled veteran renter's deduction. Provides an income tax deduction, in addition to the current renter's deduction, to a disabled veteran who rents a dwelling as a principal place of residence. Provides that the additional deduction is equal to the amount the individual is entitled to deduct under the current renter's deduction multiplied by the individual's service connected disability rating.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disabled veteran renter's deduction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28SenateSenator Zay added as second author
2021-01-14SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2021-01-12SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2021-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military
2021-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Glick

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback