IN SB0018 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the duty to support a child, which does not include support for educational needs, ceases when the child becomes 19 years of age. (Current law provides that the duty to support a child ceases when the child becomes 21 years of age.) Permits a child who is receiving child support under an order issued before July 1, 2012, to file a petition for educational needs until the child becomes 21 years of age, and specifies that a child who is receiving child support after this date may petition until the child becomes 19 years of age. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the child custody and support advisory committee.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Duty to support a child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-09 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-09 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-09 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 334: yeas 46, nays 2
2012-03-08 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2012-03-08 Dissent withdrawn
2012-03-06 House advisors appointed: McMillin, Steuerwald and Klinker
2012-03-06 House conferees appointed: Kirchhofer and Summers
2012-03-05 Senate advisors appointed: M. Young, Hume and Glick
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Steele and R. Young
2012-03-05 Senate dissented from House amendments
2012-03-05 Concurrence withdrawn
2012-03-01 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2012-02-28 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-02-28 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 253: yeas 67, nays 28
2012-02-27 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-23 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-31 First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2012-01-24 Cosponsors: Reps. McMillin and Steuerwald
2012-01-24 House sponsor: Rep. Kirchhofer
2012-01-24 Referred to the House
2012-01-24 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 55: yeas 49 and nays 1
2012-01-23 Amendment 1 (Steele), prevailed;
2012-01-23 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-01-18 Senator M. Young added as second author
2012-01-10 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2012-01-04 Authored by Senator Steele

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback