IN SB0017 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Representative Abbott D added as cosponsor
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Material harmful to minors. Removes schools and certain public libraries from the list of entities eligible for a specified defense to criminal prosecutions alleging: (1) the dissemination of material harmful to minors; or (2) a performance harmful to minors. Adds colleges and universities to the list of entities eligible for a specified defense to criminal prosecutions alleging: (1) the dissemination of material harmful to minors; or (2) a performance harmful to minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Material harmful to minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 10 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Qaddoura) failed (Y: 14 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-15HouseRepresentative Abbott D added as cosponsor
2022-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2022-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2022-02-01SenateCosponsor: Representative Prescott
2022-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Davis
2022-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 34, nays 15
2022-01-31SenateAmendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 97: yeas 10, nays 39
2022-01-31SenateAmendment #1 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 96: yeas 14, nays 35
2022-01-31SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2022-01-27SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2022-01-04SenateSenators Leising, Doriot, Garten, Baldwin, Kruse, Niemeyer added as coauthors
2022-01-04SenateSenator Young M added as third author
2022-01-04SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2022-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2022-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Tomes

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/senate/17/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/6/4/5d64f8ec/SB0017.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/6/7/b36705b3/SB0017.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/1/c/221c1669/SB0017.02.COMS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/f/0/bef07be5/SB0017.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/c/2/cec2e114/SB0017.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/5/a/765a8863/SB0017.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/8/4/0e8448d6/SB0017.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/4/3/e743de16/SB0017.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/6/b/da6b268b/SB0017.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/9/5/8a959a9a/SB0017.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/6/2/4e6205f9/SB0017.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/c/8/bcc88c4d/SB0017.96_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/5/c/2d5cfa1d/SB0017.97_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/6/f/066f1341/SB0017.139_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback