IN SB0012 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Material harmful to minors. Establishes a procedure: (1) to allow a parent or guardian of a child enrolled in a school to submit a complaint that a book in the school library is inappropriate; and (2) for the school to respond to the complaint. Establishes an appeal procedure. Provides that a school library may not make a book available that contains obscene matter or matters harmful to children. Removes schools from the list of entities eligible for a specified defense to criminal prosecutions alleging: (1) the dissemination of material harmful to minors; or (2) a performance harmful to minors. Adds colleges and universities to the list of entities eligible for a specified defense to criminal prosecutions alleging: (1) the dissemination of material harmful to minors; or (2) a performance harmful to minors.
Title
Material harmful to minors.
Sponsors
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Tyler Johnson [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Gary Byrne [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] |
Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] | Rep. Becky Cash [R] | Rep. Jake Teshka [R] |
Rep. Julie McGuire [R] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Teshka J, McGuire J, Speedy |
2023-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Cash |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 181: yeas 37, nays 12 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senator Johnson added as third author |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senators Messmer, Zay, Byrne, Sandlin, Niemeyer added as coauthors |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senator Young M added as coauthor |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tomes |